Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 432 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5626 Week
» 12677 Month
» 235078 Year
» 1119459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1004 m/e 12/1920
LNER (1924) 4004 m/e 06/1925
LNER (1946) 1804 m/e 12/1946
BR 61804 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1920
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1516
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/03/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 41 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 3w/e 31/05/1950
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
40A Lincoln m/e 21/07/1956
38A Colwick 4w/e 16/03/1957
38E Woodford Halse 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 31/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 35A New England m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 21/07/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/07/1957
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 31/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1929 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as GNR Number 1004
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1516
   
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4004    
10/1929 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1804    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61804    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
31/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61804    

prev prev