Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2550 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15956 Week
» 68972 Month
» 188499 Year
» 3215352 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1005 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4005 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1805 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61805 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
290 |
Works Number |
1517 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1920 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
16/03/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
25/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1930 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. |
SLS/194903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1005 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1517 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4005 |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1805 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61805 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61805 |
|
|