Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 427 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5621 Week
» 12672 Month
» 235073 Year
» 1119454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1005 m/e 12/1920
LNER (1924) 4005 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 1805 m/e 11/1946
BR 61805 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1920
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1517
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 41 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35A New England 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 25/05/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1930 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as GNR Number 1005
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1517
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4005    
01/1930 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1805    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61805    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61805    

prev prev