Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 209 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4455 Week
» 1563 Month
» 108509 Year
» 1330074 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1006 m/e 04/1921
LNER (1924) 4006 m/e 06/1925
LNER (1946) 1806 m/e 11/1946
BR 61806 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K304/1921
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1520
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 04/1921
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn 07/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   07/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1934 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 1006
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1520
   
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4006    
02/1934 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1806    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61806    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
07/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61806    

prev prev