Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1007 m/e 05/1921
LNER (1924) 4007 m/e 07/1924
LNER (1946) 1807 m/e 07/1946
BR 61807 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K305/1921
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1522
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 05/1921
Withdrawal Sun 04/11/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 5w/e 16/02/1952
40B Immingham w/e 20/01/1962
   Withdrawn 04/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   04/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 1007
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1522
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4007    
08/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1807    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61807    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61807    
1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev