Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1008 m/e 07/1921
LNER (1924) 4008 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 1808 m/e 09/1946
BR 61808 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K307/1921
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1526
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 07/1921
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 3w/e 31/05/1950
38A Colwick 4w/e 14/12/1957
31B March w/e 27/06/1959
40E Colwick w/e 01/08/1959
   Withdrawn 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 1008
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1526
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4008    
12/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1808    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61808    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61808    

prev prev