Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 84 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4325 Week
» 17358 Month
» 239759 Year
» 1124140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1009 m/e 08/1921
LNER (1924) 4009 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 1809 m/e 12/1946
BR 61809 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1921
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1529
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1921
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/03/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 08/01/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 1009
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1529
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4009    
07/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1809    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61809    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
03/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61809    

prev prev