Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 17 m/e 08/1924
LNER (1946) 1810 m/e 09/1946
BR 61810 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal Wed 15/08/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 38 yrs , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March w/e 20/12/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 10/12/1960
40E Colwick w/e 17/12/1960
34E New England w/e 23/09/1961
   Withdrawn 15/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England 29/06/1947
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 09/04/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   15/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1934 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 17
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1934 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1810    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61810    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
15/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61810    

prev prev