Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 945 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5076 Week
» 15246 Month
» 293042 Year
» 1177423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 28 m/e 08/1924
LNER (1946) 1811 m/e 11/1946
BR 61811 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal Sun 04/11/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/04/1960
41J Langwith Junction w/e 24/06/1961
40E Colwick w/e 09/06/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 04/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 40E Colwick 6w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   04/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1935 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 28
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1935 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1811    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61811    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
09/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61811    

prev prev