Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 427 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5621 Week
» 12672 Month
» 235073 Year
» 1119454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 32 m/e 08/1924
LNER (1946) 1812 m/e 11/1946
BR 61812 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 38 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 5w/e 16/02/1952
40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 3w/e 16/06/1956
36A Doncaster 4w/e 16/02/1957
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC MAR March 25/05/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC MAR March 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 26/01/1957
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 32
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1812    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61812    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61812    

prev prev