Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 145 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4386 Week
» 17419 Month
» 239820 Year
» 1124201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 38 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 1815 m/e 08/1946
BR 61815 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Mon 11/07/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 35 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 5w/e 24/07/1954
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/10/1954
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 08/03/1958
30A Stratford w/e 14/11/1959
   Withdrawn 11/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 23/03/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   w/e 11/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1934 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 38
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1934 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1815    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61815    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
11/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61815    

prev prev