Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 145 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4386 Week
» 17419 Month
» 239820 Year
» 1124201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 39 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 1816 m/e 05/1946
BR 61816 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Thu 31/05/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 3w/e 31/05/1950
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 21/03/1959
   Withdrawn 31/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 20/08/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1934 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 39
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1934 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1816    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61816    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
31/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61816    

prev prev