Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 46 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 1817 m/e 04/1946
BR 61817 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge w/e 20/12/1958
31B March w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 25/05/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1936 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 46
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1936 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1817    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61817    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61817    

prev prev