Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 84 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4325 Week
» 17358 Month
» 239759 Year
» 1124140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 52 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 1818 m/e 05/1946
BR 61818 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Mon 05/03/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52H Tyne Dock w/e 10/12/1960
51L Thornaby w/e 24/12/1960
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/06/1961
   Withdrawn 05/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   05/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1934 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 52
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1934 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1818    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61818    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.   Link
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
05/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61818    

prev prev