Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 73 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 1822 m/e 10/1946
BR 61822 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Sun 04/11/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 38 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 21/10/1950
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 30/04/1960
41F Mexborough w/e 18/06/1960
41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 15/07/1961
41D Canklow w/e 06/01/1962
40E Colwick w/e 09/06/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 04/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 16/10/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 41C Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 41D Canklow 01/01/1962
ALLOC 40E Colwick 6w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   04/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 73
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1822    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61822    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
09/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61822    

prev prev