Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 117 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 117 Week
» 19012 Month
» 241413 Year
» 1125794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 80 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 1824 m/e 09/1946
BR 61824 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Wed 05/07/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
38A Colwick 4w/e 23/01/1954
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 08/01/1958
   Withdrawn 05/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 29/06/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester 13/07/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 08/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 80
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1824    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61824    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
05/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61824    

prev prev