Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 91 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 1825 m/e 09/1946
BR 61825 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 14/12/1957
34E New England w/e 04/11/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 07/05/1949
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 91
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1825    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61825    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61825    

prev prev