Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 435 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5629 Week
» 12680 Month
» 235081 Year
» 1119462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 92 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 1826 m/e 10/1946
BR 61826 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 14/06/1958
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 06/02/1960
40E Colwick w/e 09/06/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 6w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 92
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1826    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61826    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
09/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61826    
1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev