Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
92 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1826 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61826 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1251 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
6w/e |
09/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1932 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 92 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1251 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1826 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61826 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61826 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|