Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 109 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 1827 m/e 06/1946
BR 61827 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
40A Lincoln w/e 10/12/1960
40E Colwick w/e 17/12/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 07/05/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1930 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 109
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1930 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1827    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61827    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61827    
1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev