Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 117 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 117 Week
» 19012 Month
» 241413 Year
» 1125794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 111 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 1828 m/e 03/1946
BR 61828 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Mon 20/03/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn 20/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   20/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 111
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1828    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61828    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61828    

prev prev