Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 112 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 1829 m/e 05/1946
BR 61829 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal Wed 28/02/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GOR Gorton m/e 07/1949
39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
40A Lincoln 4w/e 23/10/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 3w/e 16/06/1956
36A Doncaster 4w/e 16/02/1957
   Withdrawn 28/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 26/01/1957
WDN   28/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 112
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1829    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61829    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
28/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61829    

prev prev