Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 692 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14098 Week
» 67114 Month
» 186641 Year
» 3213494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
113 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1830 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
61830 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1255 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/11/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
5w/e |
26/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1933 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/06/1948 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 113 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1255 |
|
|
12/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1830 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61830 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
04/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61830 |
|
|