Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 427 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5621 Week
» 12672 Month
» 235073 Year
» 1119454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 116 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 1832 m/e 05/1946
BR 61832 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2F Woodford Halse w/e 18/07/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 29/01/1949
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 29/05/1949
EXLOAN GOR Gorton 12/06/1949
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 8w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 116
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1832    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61832    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61832    

prev prev