Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 118 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 1833 m/e 05/1946
BR 61833 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal Wed 20/09/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 3w/e 31/05/1950
38A Colwick 4w/e 23/09/1950
   Withdrawn 20/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 27/08/1950
WDN   20/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 118
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1833    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61833    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61833    

prev prev