Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 117 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 117 Week
» 19012 Month
» 241413 Year
» 1125794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 120 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 1834 m/e 06/1946
BR 61834 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1924
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal Tue 15/05/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 08/03/1958
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/08/1958
31B March w/e 14/10/1961
   Withdrawn 15/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   15/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1930 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 120
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1930 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1834    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61834    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61834    

prev prev