Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 427 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5621 Week
» 12672 Month
» 235073 Year
» 1119454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 121 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 1835 m/e 06/1946
BR 61835 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
40A Lincoln w/e 10/12/1960
40E Colwick w/e 17/12/1960
34E New England w/e 23/09/1961
34E New England w/e 21/04/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC MAR March 16/02/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC MAR March 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 28/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 121
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1835    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61835    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
16/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61835    

prev prev