Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 124 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2707 Week
» 19656 Month
» 133917 Year
» 1018298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 125 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 1836 m/e 05/1946
BR 61836 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal Mon 08/02/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
41F Mexborough w/e 07/02/1959
36A Doncaster w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn 08/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   08/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 125
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1836    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61836    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
08/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61836    

prev prev