Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 19010 Month
» 241411 Year
» 1125792 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 126 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 1837 m/e 06/1946
BR 61837 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal Fri 27/04/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 08/01/1958
   Withdrawn 27/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   27/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 126
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1837    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61837    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61837    

prev prev