Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 127 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 1838 m/e 06/1946
BR 61838 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal Mon 21/03/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 16/03/1957
38E Woodford Halse 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 21/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/07/1957
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 26/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 127
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1838    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61838    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
21/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61838    

prev prev