Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 397 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 17879 Month
» 106071 Year
» 990452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 134   01/1925
LNER (1946) 1839   01/1947
BR 61839   01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal Tue 09/01/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 37 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GOR Gorton m/e 07/1949
40B Immingham 5w/e 23/06/1951
41F Mexborough w/e 07/02/1959
36A Doncaster w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn 09/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   09/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1928 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 134
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1928 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1839    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61839    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61839    

prev prev