Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14981 Week
» 67997 Month
» 187524 Year
» 3214377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
140 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1841 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
61841 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1266 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/03/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1931 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 140 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1266 |
|
|
06/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1841 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61841 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61841 |
|
|