Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 655 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18458 Week
» 71474 Month
» 191001 Year
» 3217854 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
141 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1842 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61842 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1267 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/08/1961 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1925 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
38E |
|
Woodford Halse |
4w/e |
22/09/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1931 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
05/1934 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 141 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1267 |
|
|
02/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
05/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1842 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61842 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61842 |
|
|