Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 146 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 1844 m/e 08/1946
BR 61844 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K302/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 3w/e 31/05/1950
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 21/10/1950
31B March 4w/e 23/12/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/10/1956
52D Tweedmouth w/e 17/09/1960
52B Heaton w/e 10/12/1960
51L Thornaby w/e 24/12/1960
   Withdrawn 05/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 31B March m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 02/09/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   05/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 146
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1844    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61844    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
05/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61844    

prev prev