Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 425 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5619 Week
» 12670 Month
» 235071 Year
» 1119452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 153 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 1845 m/e 12/1946
BR 61845 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K302/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 4w/e 18/04/1953
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 04/07/1959
31B March w/e 01/08/1959
40E Colwick w/e 24/12/1960
40A Lincoln w/e 01/04/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 5w/e 08/04/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 153
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1845    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61845    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61845    

prev prev