Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 19010 Month
» 241411 Year
» 1125792 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 156 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 1846 m/e 10/1946
BR 61846 m/e 03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K302/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
   Withdrawn 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 16/05/1947
ALLOC MAR March 23/05/1947
ALLOC MAR March 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 02/09/1951
WDN   17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 156
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1846    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61846    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61846    

prev prev