Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1300 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15343 Week
» 80297 Month
» 282961 Year
» 3309814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
159 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1848 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
61848 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1273 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1931 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 159 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1273 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1848 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61848 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61848 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|