Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 398 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5367 Week
» 17880 Month
» 106072 Year
» 990453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 163   03/1925
LNER (1946) 1849   07/1946
BR 61849   08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Mon 17/04/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 20/12/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 07/03/1959
   Withdrawn 17/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 5w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   17/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 163
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1849    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61849    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61849    

prev prev