Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 833 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 833 Week
» 21815 Month
» 163769 Year
» 1048150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 167 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 1850 m/e 10/1946
BR 61850 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal During 06/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
36B Mexborough 4w/e 22/09/1956
36A Doncaster w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   30/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1934 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 167
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1934 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1850    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61850    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61850    

prev prev