Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 178 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 1852 m/e 12/1946
BR 61852 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Tue 18/07/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 3w/e 31/05/1950
40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
40B Immingham 3w/e 14/05/1955
38A Colwick 4w/e 08/01/1958
   Withdrawn 18/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   18/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 178
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1852    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61852    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61852    

prev prev