Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 180 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 1853 m/e 07/1946
BR 61853 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Tue 18/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 22/09/1956
56B Ardsley w/e 16/05/1959
56F Low Moor w/e 17/06/1961
56B Ardsley w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 18/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/10/1956
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 23/02/1958
LOAN 56B Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 91NE   4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 5w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   18/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 180
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1853    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61853    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
18/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61853    

prev prev