Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 184 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 1854 m/e 10/1946
BR 61854 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Mon 29/10/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 16/03/1957
52D Tweedmouth 5w/e 14/06/1958
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 29/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 29/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 184
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1854    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61854    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
29/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61854    

prev prev