Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 188 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 1856 m/e 12/1946
BR 61856 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 3w/e 31/05/1950
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
38B Annesley 4w/e 19/02/1955
56B Ardsley w/e 16/05/1959
   Withdrawn 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 26/02/1955
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
LOAN 56B Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 91NE   4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 188
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1856    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61856    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61856    

prev prev