Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 435 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5629 Week
» 12680 Month
» 235081 Year
» 1119462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 191 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 1857 m/e 10/1946
BR 61857 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K304/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets 31/08/1947
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 191
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1857    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61857    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61857    

prev prev