Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 336 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 336 Week
» 7141 Month
» 114087 Year
» 1335652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 195 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 1858 m/e 08/1946
BR 61858 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K304/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal Wed 26/04/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 26/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 29/04/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 195
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1858    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61858    
26/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61858    

prev prev