Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 84 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4325 Week
» 17358 Month
» 239759 Year
» 1124140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 203 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 1860 m/e 24/03/1946
BR 61860 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal Thu 16/11/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40E Colwick w/e 24/12/1960
   Withdrawn 16/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 16/02/1947
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   16/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1929 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 203
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1929 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1860    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61860    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61860    

prev prev