Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 216 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 1055 Week
» 17034 Month
» 212488 Year
» 1096869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 202 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 1861 m/e 03/1946
BR 61861 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal Fri 12/01/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
40E Colwick w/e 14/01/1961
34E New England w/e 23/09/1961
   Withdrawn 12/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   12/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 202
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1861    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61861    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
12/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61861    

prev prev