Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 204 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 1862 m/e 04/1946
BR 61862 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal Tue 16/01/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/07/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 18/10/1952
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 20/12/1958
31B March w/e 18/06/1960
   Withdrawn 16/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31B March 3w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   16/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 204
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1862    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61862    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61862    

prev prev