Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 245 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5417 Week
» 16988 Month
» 265281 Year
» 1149662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 206 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 1863 m/e 03/1946
BR 61863 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K309/1925
K506/1945
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1925 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 06/06/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys
Information Rebuilt by Thompson in 1945 - taken in to Doncaster in February and back to traffic on 16th June. However, it wan't reclassified as class K5 until 13th October 1945.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 09/1925
NEA Neasden 02/02/1926
DON Doncaster 31/05/1927
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 18/07/1930
DON Doncaster 20/07/1930
NWE New England 12/06/1931
DON Doncaster 25/06/1945
NWE New England 13/09/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 27/10/1946
STM St Margarets 15/01/1947
NWE New England 28/02/1947
MAR March 18/04/1947
STR Stratford 04/05/1947
MAR March 17/05/1947
NWE New England 23/11/1947
30A Stratford 12/10/1952
   Withdrawn 06/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC STM St Margarets 15/01/1947
ALLOC NWE New England 28/02/1947
ALLOC MAR March 08/04/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford 04/05/1947
ALLOC MAR March 17/05/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   06/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 206
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
   
02/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
31/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
20/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
05/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
13/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1863    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
15/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
28/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
18/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
04/05/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
17/05/1947 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
23/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61863    
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61863    

prev prev