Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 117 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 117 Week
» 19012 Month
» 241413 Year
» 1125794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 207 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 1864 m/e 24/03/1946
BR 61864 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K309/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 21/10/1950
38A Colwick 4w/e 23/12/1950
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
35A New England 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 207
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1864    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61864    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61864    

prev prev